Santa Fe Community College v. Ztark Broadband LLC
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Community College
Defendant: Ztark Broadband LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01151
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ztark Broadband LLC(a cancelled California Limited Liability Company) re Initial Disclosure Documents (Bohnhoff, Henry)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Santa Fe Community College First Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Mostoller, Lynn)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Santa Fe Community College Initial Disclosure Document Production (Mostoller, Lynn)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 2/17/2021 at 09:30 AM via Zoom videoconferencing before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 2/11/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's demand letter is due to Defendant by 2/1/2021. Defendant's counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 2/8/2021. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 2/9/2021.
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to join and amend by 3/3/2021. Defendant to seek leave to join and amend 3/17/2021. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 4/1/2021. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 5/3/2021. Discovery due by 6/9/2021. Discovery motions due by 6/29/2021. Pretrial motions due by 7/9/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendant by 9/24/2021 and from Defendant to the Court by 10/8/2021. (glg)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/11/2020. (glg)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Complaint Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Santa Fe Community College. Related document: #6 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Ztark Broadband LLC.(Mostoller, Lynn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 12 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Santa Fe Community College, 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Ztark Broadband LLC. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Santa Fe Community College voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Mostoller, Lynn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Ztark Broadband LLC(a cancelled California Limited Liability Company) voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Bohnhoff, Henry)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ztark Broadband LLC(a cancelled California Limited Liability Company) re Initial Disclosures (Bohnhoff, Henry)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ztark Broadband LLC(a cancelled California Limited Liability Company) re First Requests for Production on SFCC (Bohnhoff, Henry)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Santa Fe Community College for Initial Disclosures (Mostoller, Lynn)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Ztark Broadband LLC(a cancelled California Limited Liability Company) (Bohnhoff, Henry)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ztark Broadband LLC by Ztark Broadband LLC. Related document: #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim filed by Ztark Broadband LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohnhoff, Henry)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Ztark Broadband LLC. (Bohnhoff, Henry)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 11/20/2020. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 12/1/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 12/11/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/4/2020. (kmt)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ztark Broadband LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ztark Broadband LLC for Ztark Broadband LLC. (Bohnhoff, Henry)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ztark Broadband LLC from First Judicial District Court, NM, case number D-101-CV-2020-02190. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Ztark Broadband LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bohnhoff, Henry)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7395543 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ztark Broadband LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bohnhoff, Henry)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santa Fe Community College v. Ztark Broadband LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ztark Broadband LLC
Represented By: Henry M. Bohnhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Community College
Represented By: Lynn E Mostoller
Represented By: Alison Kitchel Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?