Martinello v. United States of America et al.
Plaintiff: Albert Martinello
Defendant: Department of Agriculture, Forest Service and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01200
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Martinello. Department of Agriculture, Forest Service served on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Romero, E.)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Martinello. United States Attorney's Office served on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021 (Romero, E.) Modified on 12/9/2020 (arp).
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Martinello. United States Attorney General served on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Romero, E.) Modified on 12/9/2020 (arp).
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Albert Martinello voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Romero, E.)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Department of Agriculture, Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 17, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
November 17, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7411205 re #1 Complaint filed by Albert Martinello (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Romero, E.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Albert Martinello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Denial of Claim)(Romero, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinello v. United States of America et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture, Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Martinello
Represented By: E. Marvin Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?