Doe v. The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2020cv01207
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Shanor, Stephen)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Shanor on behalf of The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico (Shanor, Stephen)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico served on 12/01/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Hart, Nicholas) Modified the served date and answer date on 12/8/2020 as per Attorney Nicholas Hart. (nr).
November 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico. (jg)
November 19, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7415946 re #1 Complaint filed by Jane Doe (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hart, Nicholas)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Jane Doe (Hart, Nicholas)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jane Doe. (Hart, Nicholas)
November 18, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Ramon A. Soto
Represented By: Nicholas Thomas Hart
Represented By: Harry Jesse Jacobus, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?