Moore v. USA
Petitioner: Sharon Moore
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01224
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Response due by 2/4/2021. (smd)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Pena, Jeremy)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Pena on behalf of USA (Pena, Jeremy)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The Clerks Office shall forward to the United States Attorneys Office a copy of Petitioners Motion (CV Doc. 1) and Memorandum of Law (CV Doc. 2), along with a copy of this Order. The United States must FILE a habeas response within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. (smd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/2/2020) (ln). Modified text on 12/2/2020 (ln).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Sharon Moore. (gr)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Sharon Moore. (gr)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Jeremy Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sharon Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?