Vigil v. City of Espanola et al
Plaintiff: Robert Vigil
Defendant: Mark Trujillo, Sally Baxter, City of Espanola Police Department, City of Espanola and Raymond Romero
Case Number: 1:2020cv01265
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Paul Kelly
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and dismissing the ADA claims against the individual defendants; finding as moot #8 Joint Motion to Dismiss personal capacity ADA claims. (rt)
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Personal Capacity ADA Claims With Prejudice by Sally Baxter, Raymond Romero, Mark Trujillo. (Robeda, Andrea)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Sally Baxter, Raymond Romero, Mark Trujillo re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Raymond Romero, Sally Baxter, Mark Trujillo (Robeda, Andrea)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sally Baxter, Raymond Romero, Mark Trujillo. (Robeda, Andrea)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Dec 28 2020 filed by Robert Vigil. (Salcedo, Betsy)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Sally Baxter, City of Espanola, City of Espanola Police Department, Raymond Romero, Mark Trujillo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Robeda, Andrea)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sally Baxter, Raymond Romero, Mark Trujillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2) (Robeda, Andrea)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Espanola, City of Espanola Police Department. (Robeda, Andrea)
December 7, 2020 United States Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr)
December 7, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7440446 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Raymond Romero, Sally Baxter, City of Espanola Police Department, Mark Trujillo, City of Espanola (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Robeda, Andrea)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-cv-2020-00384. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Robeda, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil v. City of Espanola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Trujillo
Represented By: Andrea K. Robeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Baxter
Represented By: Andrea K. Robeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Espanola Police Department
Represented By: Andrea K. Robeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Espanola
Represented By: Andrea K. Robeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Romero
Represented By: Andrea K. Robeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Vigil
Represented By: Betsy R Salcedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?