Waldecker v. Edgewater Technical Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Matthew Waldecker
Defendant: Edgewater Technical Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01298
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 02:15 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/8/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/5/2021. (cda)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Edgewater Technical Associates, LLC (Mier, Keith)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Edgewater Technical Associates, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Matthew Waldecker.(Mier, Keith)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Waldecker. Edgewater Technical Associates, LLC served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Josephson, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Matthew Waldecker (Dunlap, Andrew)
December 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to Edgewater Technical Associates, LLC. (jg)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edgewater Technical Associates, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Matthew Waldecker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)
December 15, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7455197 re #1 Complaint filed by Matthew Waldecker (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Josephson, Michael)
December 15, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waldecker v. Edgewater Technical Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewater Technical Associates, LLC
Represented By: Keith C. Mier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Waldecker
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Richard Burch
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?