Tacitus, LLC v. Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tacitus, LLC
Defendant: Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01300
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg)
February 10, 2021 Filing 25 Clerk's Minutes for oral argument hearing held on 2/10/2021 before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg) Modified date on 2/12/2021 (vh).
February 5, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Remand Motion to Stay or Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Remand filed by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.. (Marshall, Gregory)
January 29, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Tacitus, LLC re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Tacitus, LLC (Harrison, Jeremy)
January 29, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Remand Motion to Stay or Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Remand filed by Tacitus, LLC. (Harrison, Jeremy)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Counsel shall appear via Zoom video conference for oral argument on Defendant's #17 "Motion to Stay or Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Remand" on 2/10/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (gbg)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Initial Scheduling Order and Initial Scheduling Conference (Doc. 19) is granted. The Court's Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 5), and all hearings and deadlines set forth therein, are vacated, to be reset if appropriate after the pending motions identified in the Joint Motion have been resolved. (kmt)
January 26, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Vacate #5 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.. (Marshall, Gregory)
January 21, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Marshall, Gregory)
January 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Remand Motion to Stay or Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Remand by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.. (Marshall, Gregory)
January 15, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.. (Marshall, Gregory)
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tacitus, LLC. (Harrison, Jeremy)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Tacitus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Harrison, Jeremy)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Tacitus, LLC. (Harrison, Jeremy)
December 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Tacitus, LLC, 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cfa)
December 30, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Tacitus, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Harrison, Jeremy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (glg)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Tacitus, LLC re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Agreed Extension to File Response Brief (Harrison, Jeremy)
December 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Marshall, Gregory)
December 24, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Air Liquide Helium America, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Marshall, Gregory)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 1/19/2021. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 1/29/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 2/10/2021 at 4:00 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call the Court's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. (glg)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Because a dispositive motion has been filed in this case, the parties are reminded, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as the trial judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by December 30, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.. (Marshall, Gregory)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc. from Eleventh Judicial District Court, case number D-1116-CV-2020-01348. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Marshall, Gregory)
December 15, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7455249 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Air Liquide Helium America, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marshall, Gregory)
December 15, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tacitus, LLC v. Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Liquide Helium America, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Marshall
Represented By: Jeanne Y Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tacitus, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy K. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?