Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Defendant: Phillip Nickse, Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington and Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01351
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos E Sedillo on behalf of Todd Lopez (Sedillo, Carlos)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Todd Lopez re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez (Sedillo, Carlos)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Reply in Support of His Motion to Remand filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COVID-19 Liability: Tort, Workplace Safety and Securities Law) (Sedillo, Carlos)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Todd Lopez Notice of Extension for Plaintiff's Reply to its Motion to Remand (Sedillo, Carlos) Modified text to remove abbreviation on 2/4/2021 (vv).
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E) (Waleko, Alexandra)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (khs)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Phillip Nickse. (Beerle, Sandra)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington. (Beerle, Sandra)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Centers of America, Inc.. (Beerle, Sandra)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-02515. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Ex C)(Coronel, Patrick)
December 28, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7470963 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Life Care Center of Farmington, Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coronel, Patrick)
December 28, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Nickse
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Operations, LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Center of Farmington
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Represented By: Nichole Lynn Henry
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?