United Urology Centers, LLC v. OptumCare New Mexico, LLC
Plaintiff: United Urology Centers, LLC
Defendant: OptumCare New Mexico, LLC and DaVita Medical Group New Mexico, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00011
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 8/2/2021 at 9:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 7/23/2021 at 2:30 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter Code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's demand letter is due to Defendant by 7/6/2021. Defendant's counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 7/20/2021. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 7/22/2021. (glg)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to join and amend by 3/1/2021. Defendant to seek leave to join and amend 4/1/2021. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 8/2/2021. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 9/2/2021. Discovery due by 11/2/2021. Discovery motions due by 11/22/2021. Pretrial motions due by 12/2/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendant by 3/4/2022 and from Defendant to the Court by 3/18/2022. (glg)
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 2/25/2021. (glg)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Urology Centers, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Bohnhoff, Henry)
February 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by OptumCare New Mexico, LLC Certificate of Service re Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (Burris, Eric)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by OptumCare New Mexico, LLC (Burris, Eric)
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-7500118 re: 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant OptumCare New Mexico, LLC. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by OptumCare New Mexico, LLC Certificate of Good Standing of Erica Gomer (Burris, Eric)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant OptumCare New Mexico, LLC by Eric R. Burris on behalf of: Erica Gomer Akerman LLP 201 East Las Olas Blvd, Suite 1800Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301 954-331-4122 erica.gomer@akerman.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burris, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by OptumCare New Mexico, LLC Certificate of Good Standing of James Bombulie (Burris, Eric)
January 19, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7500254 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by OptumCare New Mexico, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burris, Eric)
January 17, 2021 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant OptumCare New Mexico, LLC by Eric R. Burris on behalf of: James Bombulie Akerman LLP 98 Southeast Seventh Street, Suite 1100Miami, FL 33131 305-982-5514 james.bombulie@akerman.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burris, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumCare New Mexico, LLC identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group, Inc. for OptumCare New Mexico, LLC. (Burris, Eric)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Breach of Sublease and Affirmative Defenses by OptumCare New Mexico, LLC. (Burris, Eric)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 2/4/2021. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 2/16/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 2/25/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/19/2021. (kmt)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee received online: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-7481288 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
January 6, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OptumCare New Mexico, LLC f/k/a DaVita Medical Group New Mexico, LLC from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-06590. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by OptumCare New Mexico, LLC. (Burris, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Urology Centers, LLC v. OptumCare New Mexico, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumCare New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: James Bombulie
Represented By: Erica Gomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaVita Medical Group New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: James Bombulie
Represented By: Erica Gomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Urology Centers, LLC
Represented By: Henry M. Bohnhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?