Faifer v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Savannah Faifer
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. and CooperSurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00026
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Leigh Martin May (MDL 2974). (kg)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Faifer. The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Kaufman, Justin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Faifer. Teva Women's Health, LLC served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Kaufman, Justin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Faifer. Teva Women's Health, Inc. served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Kaufman, Justin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Faifer. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 1/21/2021. (Kaufman, Justin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Faifer. CooperSurgical, Inc. served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Kaufman, Justin)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Savannah Faifer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufman, Justin)
January 11, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7489356 re #1 Complaint filed by Savannah Faifer (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin)
January 11, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
January 11, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faifer v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah Faifer
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Represented By: Caren I Friedman
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?