United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 1564 v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 1564
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00181
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. of Stipulated Extension of Time to File its Reply to Motion to Dismiss (Stahl, Thomas)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 1564. (Montalbano, James)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 5 and 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (kc)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stahl, Thomas)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 3/8/21 Acknowledgement filed by United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 1564. (Montalbano, James)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (RE-FILED) to Compel Compliance with Arbitration Procedure against Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 1564. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Montalbano, James)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 FILED IN ERROR - COMPLAINT to Compel Compliance with Arbitration Procedure against Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 1564. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Montalbano, James) Modified on 3/2/2021 (arp).
March 1, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7566748 re #1 Complaint, filed by United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 1564 (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Montalbano, James)
March 1, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
March 1, 2021 Summons Issued as to Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 1564 v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 1564
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?