Johnson et al v. Sanchez et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Thompson, Amber Johnson and RT
Defendant: Dedre Mellon, New Mexico Children, Youth & Families Department and Charity Sanchez
Case Number: 1:2021cv00184
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Against Deidre Mallon. Response due by 4/30/2021. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah) Modified on 4/22/2021 (yc).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #8 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Response due by 4/30/2021. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FILED IN ERROR** First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST DEIDRE MALLON by Amber Johnson. (Keller, Mark) Modified on 4/22/2021 (duplicate filing) (yc).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST DEIDRE MALLON by Amber Johnson. (Keller, Mark)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Amber Johnson. (Keller, Mark)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing VACATING Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference on 4/15/2021 at 2:15 p.m. The Rule 16 conference will be reset, if appropriate, once the pending #8 MOTION to Stay has been decided. [THIS IS A TEXT-ENTRY ONLY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Dedre Mellon, New Mexico Children, Youth & Families Department, Charity Sanchez. (Olivas, Sean)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Dedre Mellon, New Mexico Children, Youth & Families Department, Charity Sanchez (Olivas, Sean)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST DEIDRE MALLON by Dedre Mellon, New Mexico Children, Youth & Families Department, Charity Sanchez. (Olivas, Sean)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Filing Fee: $ 402, receipt number ALB049279 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 02:15 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 4/8/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/24/2021. (cda)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-06451. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Walters, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Sanchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Thompson
Represented By: Teresa Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Johnson
Represented By: Teresa Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RT
Represented By: Teresa Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dedre Mellon
Represented By: Ryan M Walters
Represented By: Sean Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Children, Youth & Families Department
Represented By: Ryan M Walters
Represented By: Sean Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charity Sanchez
Represented By: Ryan M Walters
Represented By: Sean Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?