Guzman v. New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Gilbert Guzman
Defendant: New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA) and City of Santa Fe
Case Number: 1:2021cv00198
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA) re #16 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA) (Butler, Timothy)
April 29, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to NMDCA Reply in Support MTD) (Butler, Timothy)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. All claims against Defendant City of Santa Fe are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The parties hereto shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. (ve)
April 22, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal by City of Santa Fe (Martinez, Marcos)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The #2 First Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (ve)
April 12, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gilbert Guzman. (Quintero, Penelope)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Gilbert Guzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Quintero, Penelope)
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Santa Fe. (Martinez, Marcos)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NMDCA Response Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit NMDCA Response Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit NMDCA Response Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit NMDCA Response Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit NMDCA Response Exhibit 5) (Butler, Timothy)
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NMDCA MTD Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit NMDCAMTD Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit NMDCA MTD Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit NMDCA MTD Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit NMDCA MTD Exhibit 5) (Butler, Timothy)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L Butler on behalf of New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA) (Butler, Timothy)
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Nelson Ives on behalf of New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA) (Ives, Peter)
March 19, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gilbert Guzman Order Denying Request for Ex-Parte Hearing and Order Setting Briefing Schedule to City of Santa Fe (Quintero, Penelope)
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert Guzman. New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA)(407 Galisteo St, #260, Santa Fe, NM 87501) served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Quintero, Penelope) Modified on 3/18/2021 to reflect service address (cmm).
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert Guzman. City of Santa Fe served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Quintero, Penelope)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 --FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert Guzman. (Quintero, Penelope) Modified on 3/18/2021 - Filed in error (incorrect event (cmm).
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert Guzman. New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA) (408 Galisteo St, Villagra Building, Santa Fe, NM 87501) served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Quintero, Penelope) Modified on 3/18/2021 to reflect address served (cmm).
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR** Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum for Isabella Sharpe for City of Santa Fe Returned Executed on March 10, 2021., ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Affidavit of Service, Acknowledgement filed by Gilbert Guzman., Summons Returned Unexecuted by Gilbert Guzman as to City of Santa Fe., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert Guzman. (Quintero, Penelope) Modified on 3/18/2021-Filed in error (incorrect event) (cmm).
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on New Mexico State Department - Attorney General on March 12, 2021, filed by Gilbert Guzman. (Quintero, Penelope)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on New Mexico State Department, Peter Ives, Legal Counsel and Authorized Agent on March 10, 2021, filed by Gilbert Guzman. (Quintero, Penelope) Modified on 3/17/2021 to reflect who was served (cmm).
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on City of Santa Fe, Isabella Sharpe, Constituent Service Specialist and Authorized Agent, on March 10, 2021, filed by Gilbert Guzman. (Quintero, Penelope) Modified on 3/17/2021 to reflect who was served(cmm).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EX-PARTE HEARING AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Plaintiff SHALL SERVE the complaint and summons, the motion, and this order on the appropriate Defendants and/or entities. Defendants shall respond to #2 Plaintiff's Verified Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction within fourteen (14) days of service of the motion. Plaintiff may reply within seven (7) days of the filing of the response. (ve)
March 8, 2021 Summons Issued as to City of Santa Fe, New Mexico, New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs. (jg)
March 8, 2021 United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Information Sheet for TRO by Gilbert Guzman (Quintero, Penelope)
March 8, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7578488 re #1 Complaint, filed by Gilbert Guzman (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Quintero, Penelope)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Gilbert Guzman. (Quintero, Penelope)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Threatened Violation of VARA and Breach of Contract against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Gilbert Guzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quintero, Penelope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico State Department of Cultural Affairs (DCA)
Represented By: Peter Nelson Ives
Represented By: Timothy L Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Guzman
Represented By: Penelope M. Quintero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?