Silverline Construction, LLC v. Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Silverline Construction, LLC
Defendant: Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00218
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Silverline Construction, LLC (Schlagel, Rodney)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc. for Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc.. (Calvert, Sean)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc. Offer of Settlement (Calvert, Sean)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TELEPHONIC INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 5/18/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Five minutes prior to the start of the Conference, the parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 5/6/2021. (smd)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc. of Certification of Good Standing of Associated Counsel L. Jay Labe (Calvert, Sean)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc. by Sean R Calvert on behalf of: L. Jay Labe Allen & Curry, P.C. 1125 Seventeenth St., Ste. 1275Denver, CO 80202 (720) 386-2898 jlabe@allen-curry.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Calvert, Sean)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Silverline Construction, LLC.(Calvert, Sean)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7629947 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Calvert, Sean)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Breach of Contract, Wrongful Termination and Violation of the Prompt Payment Act served on Defendant Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc. on 03/18/2021, filed by Silverline Construction, LLC. (Schlagel, Rodney)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Silverline Construction, LLC (Schlagel, Rodney)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing Fee: $ 402, receipt number ALB049358 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc. (arp)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Wrongful Termination and Violation of the Prompt Payment Act against Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Silverline Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlagel, Rodney)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverline Construction, LLC v. Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silverline Construction, LLC
Represented By: Jason J. Patton
Represented By: Rodney L. Schlagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Electrical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Sean R Calvert
Represented By: L. Jay Labe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?