Johnson v. Bank of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Defendant: Bank of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00294
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY UNTIL RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. No discovery may be taken by any party until Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5) is resolved. This order does not apply to initial disclosures under Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1). (tl)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery Until Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Bank of America, Inc.. (Edelman, Spencer)
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Johnson. (Regazzi, Mark)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 5/14/2021. (tl)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of America, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Edelman, Spencer) Modified text on 5/13/2021 (bap).
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Bank of America, Inc. (Edelman, Spencer)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Michael Johnson (Regazzi, Mark)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). In light of the pending dispositive motion, the parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (mlt)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bank of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Edelman, Spencer)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 4/23/2021. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 5/4/2021. A telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 5/14/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call the Court's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/7/2021. (tl)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Bank of America, Inc. (Edelman, Spencer)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. from Second Judicial District Court of New Mexico, case number D 202 CV 2021 01194. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edelman, Spencer)
March 31, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7619807 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Edelman, Spencer)
March 31, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Bank of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Represented By: Mark D Regazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?