Boulanger v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julie Boulanger
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., Farmington Hotel Assets, LLC a domestic limited liability company doing business as Courtyard by Marriott and Galaxy Hotels Group
Case Number: 1:2021cv00315
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 3. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
May 28, 2021 Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Julie Boulanger. (Weems, Dathan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Farmington Hotel Assets, LLC, Marriott International, Inc.. (Callaway, Timothy)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C Callaway on behalf of Farmington Hotel Assets, LLC, Marriott International, Inc. (Callaway, Timothy)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Boulanger. Marriott International, Inc. served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021. (Weems, Dathan)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Galaxy Hotels Group (a foreign corporation) by Julie Boulanger (Weems, Dathan)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR**MOTION to Dismiss Party Galaxy Hotels Group by Julie Boulanger. (Weems, Dathan) Modified to add error text as per filing attorneys office (Jennifer) on 5/7/2021 (jjs).
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Boulanger. Galaxy Hotels Group served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Weems, Dathan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Boulanger. Farmington Hotel Assets, LLC served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Weems, Dathan)
April 21, 2021 Summons Issued as to Farmington Hotel Assets, LLC, Galaxy Hotels Group, Marriott International, Inc.. (jg)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Personal Injuries and Lost Wages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Julie Boulanger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weems, Dathan)
April 8, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number BNMDC-7631554 re #1 Complaint filed by Julie Boulanger (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Weems, Dathan)
April 8, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boulanger v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Boulanger
Represented By: Bridget J Hazen
Represented By: Dathan Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy C Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Hotel Assets, LLC a domestic limited liability company doing business as Courtyard by Marriott
Represented By: Timothy C Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galaxy Hotels Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?