Rogers v. 3Bear Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Cody A Rogers
Defendant: 3Bear Energy, LLC
Intervenor: Applied Consultants, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00376
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas M Williams on behalf of Applied Consultants, LLC (Williams, Lucas)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by Applied Consultants, LLC. (Williams, Lucas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Supporting Brief by 3Bear Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Jennifer Lacy, #2 Exhibit 2, Doucet v. Boardwalk Pipelines Memorandum and Recommendation) (Rittenhouse, Joby)
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joby Rittenhouse on behalf of 3Bear Energy, LLC (Rittenhouse, Joby)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. 3Bear Energy, LLC answer due 6/10/2021. (kfo)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 3Bear Energy, LLC. (Domas, Stephen)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cody A Rogers. 3Bear Energy, LLC served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021. (Rustmann, Rachael)
May 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to 3Bear Energy, LLC. (jg)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 26, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Rustmann on behalf of Cody A Rogers (Rustmann, Rachael)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Cody A Rogers (Dunlap, Andrew)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3Bear Energy, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Cody A Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)
April 23, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7658050 re #1 Complaint filed by Cody A Rogers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. 3Bear Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody A Rogers
Represented By: Richard Burch
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Rachael Rustmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3Bear Energy, LLC
Represented By: Joby Rittenhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Applied Consultants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?