Perales v. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel Perales
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers, LLC doing business as Pilot Flying J
Case Number: 1:2021cv00434
Filed: May 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Bobby R Baldock
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Pilot Travel Centers, LLC re 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing for Thomas J. Cortazzo (Marshall, Jessica)
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Pilot Travel Centers, LLC by Jessica D Marshall on behalf of: Thomas J. Cortazzo Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP 400 Poydras St., 13th Fl.New Orleans, LA 70130 504-322-4100 Fax 504-754.7569 tom.cortazzo@lewisbrisbois.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Marshall, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings until July 30, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to file a status report no later than July 30, 2021. (rcf)
June 16, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7744153 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Pilot Travel Centers, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marshall, Jessica)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Pilot Travel Centers, LLC. (Marshall, Jessica)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion Extending Answer Deadline. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than June 15, 2021. (rcf)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Deadline by Pilot Travel Centers, LLC. (Marshall, Jessica)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Pilot Travel Centers, LLC re 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing for Alan L. Rupe (Marshall, Jessica)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Pilot Travel Centers, LLC by Jessica D Marshall on behalf of: Alan L. Rupe Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP 1605 N. Waterfront Parkway, Suite 150Wichita, Kansas 67206 316-609-7901 Fax 316-462-5746 alan.rupe@lewisbrisbois.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Marshall, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 3, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7723974 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Pilot Travel Centers, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marshall, Jessica)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica D Marshall on behalf of Pilot Travel Centers, LLC (Marshall, Jessica)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Perales. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC served on 5/10/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Parmet, Matthew)
May 10, 2021 United States Circuit Judge Bobby R Baldock and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
May 10, 2021 Summons Issued as to Pilot Travel Centers, LLC. (jg)
May 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pilot Travel Centers, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Daniel Perales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parmet, Matthew)
May 8, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7682204 re #1 Complaint filed by Daniel Perales (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Parmet, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perales v. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Perales
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers, LLC doing business as Pilot Flying J
Represented By: Alan Rupe
Represented By: Jessica D Marshall
Represented By: Thomas Cortazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?