Wilson Jr. v. InterContinental Hotels Group
Plaintiff: Johnnie James Wilson Jr.
Defendant: InterContinental Hotels Group doing business as Holiday Inn Express
Case Number: 1:2021cv00502
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Clerk is directed to transfer Plaintiff's recently filed documents to the Southern District of California for its consideration, case no. 3:21-cv-01059. This Court will not consider or transfer any additional documents that Plaintiff files in this case. (ke)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM Against Inequities and Injustices filed by Johnnie James Wilson Jr.. (vh)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Objection to Transferring venue to Southern District of California filed by Johnnie James Wilson Jr. re #4 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (cer)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRINGVENUE TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza Related document(s): #1 Complaint. (arn)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnnie James Wilson Jr.. (jg) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/2/2021) (jg).
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against InterContinental Hotels Group, filed by Johnnie James Wilson Jr.. (jg)
June 1, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson Jr. v. InterContinental Hotels Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie James Wilson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterContinental Hotels Group doing business as Holiday Inn Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?