Bernhard v. Meow Wolf, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Bernhard
Defendant: Meow Wolf, Inc. and Meow Wolf Santa Fe LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00509
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFF ELISABETH BERNHARD'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO REMAND filed by Elisabeth Bernhard. (Hunt, Lee)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Meow Wolf, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Barceleau, Matthew)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding good cause to extend the time to issue the scheduling order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). The Court will delay the issuance of its Initial Scheduling Order pending resolution of #3 Motion to Remand. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Meow Wolf, Inc. (Biehler, Gregory)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injuries by Meow Wolf, Inc.. (Biehler, Gregory)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Elisabeth Bernhard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Hunt, Lee)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meow Wolf, Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2021-00795. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Meow Wolf, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Complaint)(Biehler, Gregory)
June 2, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7720695 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Meow Wolf, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Biehler, Gregory)
June 2, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernhard v. Meow Wolf, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meow Wolf, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Represented By: Matthew I. Barceleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meow Wolf Santa Fe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Bernhard
Represented By: Aimee Sue Bevan
Represented By: Lee R Hunt
Represented By: Aimee S. Bevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?