Sabeerin et al v. Fassler et al
Plaintiff: Boback Sabeerin and S.S.
Defendant: Tim Fassler, City of Albuquerque, Albuquerque Police Department and John Dear
Case Number: 1:2021cv00512
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Boback Sabeerin. (gr)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Boback Sabeerin. (gr)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Boback Sabeerin. (gr)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Boback Sabeerin. (gr)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by City of Albuquerque. (Dalton, Kristin)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by City of Albuquerque. (Dalton, Kristin)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by City of Albuquerque. (Dalton, Kristin)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Scheduling Order deadlines will be reset after a ruling on the pending dispositive motions. The deadline to consent remains 6/28/2021. The Scheduling Conference on 7/13/2021 is VACATED. (smd)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time Dismissal Response by Boback Sabeerin. (nr)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION For Remand by Boback Sabeerin. (nr)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Boback Sabeerin. (nr)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Albuquerque. (Dalton, Kristin)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Filing Fee: $ 402, receipt number ALB050057 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Five minutes prior to the start of the Conference, the parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 6/28/2021. (smd)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Transmittal of State Court Documents by City of Albuquerque (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dalton, Kristin) Modified security for Exhibit #1 on 6/7/2021 due to personal identifiers listed (gr).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (Dalton, Kristin)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Albuquerque from State of New Mexico Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1314-CV-2021-374. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by City of Albuquerque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dalton, Kristin) Modified security due to personal information on 6/4/2021 (jg).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabeerin et al v. Fassler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Fassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: Kristin J Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albuquerque Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boback Sabeerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?