Graham v. Albuquerque Institute for Mathematics and Science at UNM
Plaintiff: Marybeth A Graham
Defendant: Albuquerque Institute for Mathematics and Science at UNM
Case Number: 1:2021cv00523
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marybeth A Graham as to Albuquerque Institute for Mathematics and Science at UNM. (Hofstra, Lily)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marybeth A Graham (Katzerman, Jerri) Modified on 6/28/2021 (jg).
June 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Albuquerque Institute for Mathematics and Science at UNM. (jg)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS UNDER THE INDIVIDUALS WITH DISABILITIES EDUCATION ACT against ALBUQUERQUE INSTITUTE FOR MATHEMATICS and SCIENCE at UNM, ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Marybeth A Graham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Hofstra, Lily)
June 8, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7731526 re #1 Complaint, filed by Marybeth A Graham (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hofstra, Lily)
June 8, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Albuquerque Institute for Mathematics and Science at UNM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybeth A Graham
Represented By: Jerri K. Katzerman
Represented By: Lily Hofstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albuquerque Institute for Mathematics and Science at UNM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?