Gallegos Jr. v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richard J. Gallegos, Jr.
Defendant: New Residential Investment Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation and NewRez, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00554
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHH Mortgage Corporation Certificate Service of PHH's Initial Disclosures (Yarrington, Andrew) Modified text on 8/13/2021 (yc).
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation (Yarrington, Andrew)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Residential Investment Corporation, NewRez, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENT CORPORATION for New Residential Investment Corporation; Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners, LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Mortgage, LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisitions LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquistion II LLC for NewRez, LLC. (Alonso, Gabriella)
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Isom on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Isom, Jennifer)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P Yarrington on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Yarrington, Andrew)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie G. Siler on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Siler, Jamie)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO VACATE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. This case has been assigned to Judge Browning who will conduct both the discovery and trial proceedings. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque with Judge Fashing is VACATED and will be reset by Judge Browning at a later date. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E) (Alonso, Gabriella)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by New Residential Investment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alonso, Gabriella)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 DEFENDANTS PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION AND NEWREZ, LLCS ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Alonso, Gabriella)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard J. Gallegos, Jr. of Service of Initial Scheduling Order upon all Defendants (Kramer, David)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 8/2/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/8/2021. (ccp)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial District Court in Bernalillo County, case number D-202-CV-2021-03103. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Alonso, Gabriella)
June 16, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7744241 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENT CORPORATION, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, NEWREZ, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Alonso, Gabriella)
June 16, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallegos Jr. v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Gallegos, Jr.
Represented By: David C Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Investment Corporation
Represented By: Gabriella Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Gabriella Alonso
Represented By: Andrew P Yarrington
Represented By: Jamie G. Siler
Represented By: Jennifer Isom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC
Represented By: Gabriella Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?