Peters v. Frontiere et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Peters
Defendant: Michael Ghiselli, Tarsin Mobile, Inc., Joseph Cellura, Nicholas Frontiere, Joseph Frontiere and Alexander Aizenshtadt
Case Number: 1:2021cv00564
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ccp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerald Peters Rule 68 Offer of Settlement (Contreras, Breanna)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Defendants Joseph Frontiere and Nicholas Frontiere, CROSSCLAIM against Joseph Cellura, Michael Ghiselli by Nicholas Frontiere, Joseph Frontiere.(Jacobs, Michael)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #16 MOTION to Stay Defendants/Crossclaim Defendants Michael Ghiselli and Joseph Celluras Motion to Stay Pending Litigation Notice of Filing Exhibits to Defendants/Crossclaim Defendants Michael Ghiselli and Joseph Celluras Motion to Stay Pending Litigation by Joseph Cellura, Michael Ghiselli (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Gentile, Robert)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Defendants/Crossclaim Defendants Michael Ghiselli and Joseph Celluras Motion to Stay Pending Litigation by Joseph Cellura, Michael Ghiselli. (Gentile, Robert)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Frontiere, Nicholas Frontiere (Defendants J. Frontiere and N. Frontiere Initial Disclosures) (Jacobs, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Joseph Cellura, Michael Ghiselli, Tarsin Mobile, Inc. of Withdrawal of Attorney (Gentile, Robert)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerald Peters Rule 1-026(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Contreras, Breanna)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Cellura, Michael Ghiselli, Tarsin Mobile, Inc. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Gentile, Robert)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Joseph Frontiere, Nicholas Frontiere (Notice of Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint) (Jacobs, Michael)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Crossclaim Defendants Michael Ghiselli, Joseph Cellura, and Tarsin Mobile, Inc.'s ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint for Damages, Accounting, and Constructive Trust by Joseph Cellura, Michael Ghiselli, Tarsin Mobile, Inc..(Gentile, Robert)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages, Accounting, and Constructive Trust against All Defendants., filed by Gerald Peters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Common Stock Purchase Warrant)(Contreras, Breanna)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Crossclaim Defendants Michael Ghiselli, Joseph Cellura, and Tarsin Mobile, Inc.'s ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Crossclaim, by Joseph Cellura, Michael Ghiselli, Tarsin Mobile, Inc..(Gentile, Robert)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Gerald Peters re. Motion to Dismiss (Contreras, Breanna)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Defendant Joseph Frontiere's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) For Damages, Accounting, and Constructive Trusts, CROSSCLAIM against Joseph Cellura, Michael Ghiselli, Tarsin Mobile, Inc. by Joseph Frontiere. (Sakura, Julie)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Joseph Frontiere (Notice of Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) (Jacobs, Michael)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joseph Frontiere. (Jacobs, Michael)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 1 (Albuquerque). (jg)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Joseph Frontiere (Jacobs, Michael)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joseph Frontiere from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2021-00318. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Joseph Frontiere. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Jacobs, Michael)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7748144 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Joseph Frontiere (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jacobs, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Frontiere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ghiselli
Represented By: David Ketai
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarsin Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: David Ketai
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cellura
Represented By: David Ketai
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Frontiere
Represented By: Julie Sakura
Represented By: Michael Edmund Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Frontiere
Represented By: Michael Edmund Jacobs
Represented By: Julie Sakura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Aizenshtadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Peters
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: Breanna Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?