Tapia v. TA Operating, LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Tapia
Defendant: TA Operating, LLC doing business as TravelCenters of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00579
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 14 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 08/19/2021. (cm)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 12/07/2021 at 10:30 a.m. The purpose of this conference is to discuss setting a settlement conference. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 398-2342 [Access Code: 2418431] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 02/28/2022. Discovery Motions due by 03/22/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 03/31/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 07/15/2022. (cm)
August 6, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by TA Operating, LLC (Ferguson, Kenneth)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 08/19/2021 at 01:30 PM. Joint Status Report due by 08/09/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 07/27/2021. (cm)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury Trial by TA Operating, LLC. (Ferguson, Kenneth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 25, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TA Operating, LLC (Ferguson, Kenneth)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by TA Operating, LLC (Ferguson, Kenneth)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TA Operating, LLC from 7th Judicial District Court of New Mexico, case number D-722-CV-2021-00041. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by TA Operating, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferguson, Kenneth)
June 24, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7757196 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TA Operating, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferguson, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tapia v. TA Operating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Operating, LLC doing business as TravelCenters of America, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Tapia
Represented By: Nicholas A Norden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?