Dub-L-EE, LLC v. J. Carrizal General Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dub-L-EE, LLC
Defendant: J. Carrizal General Construction, Inc. and Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00624
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Bobby R Baldock
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, by Circuit Judge Bobby R Baldock. (CP)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to Cincinnati Insurance Company, J. Carrizal General Construction, Inc.. (jg)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dub-L-EE, LLC., filed by Dub-L-EE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stevens-Block, Leah)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Dub-L-EE, LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #5 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 12(b)(2) for extension to respond (Stevens-Block, Leah)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon K. Bains on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company (Bains, Brandon)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector A. Beltran on behalf of J. Carrizal General Construction, Inc. (Beltran, Hector)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 12(b)(2) by J. Carrizal General Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Declaration of J Carrizal) (Beltran, Hector)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bains, Brandon)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 12(b)(2) by J. Carrizal General Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of J Carrizal) (Beltran, Hector)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Circuit Judge Bobby R Baldock and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Insurance Company, J. Carrizal General Construction, Inc.. (jg)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number ANMDC-7773143 re #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Dub-L-EE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Stevens-Block, Leah) filed by Dub-L-EE, LLC. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Dub-L-EE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Stevens-Block, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dub-L-EE, LLC v. J. Carrizal General Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dub-L-EE, LLC
Represented By: Leah M Stevens-Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Carrizal General Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Hector A. Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Brandon K. Bains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?