Eichler et al v. InBANK et al
Plaintiff: Frederick V. Eichler, IV, Michele M. Eichler and Frederick V. Eichler
Defendant: InBANK, South State Bank, N.A. formerly known as CenterState Bank, N.A. doing business as ARC Fixed Rate Provider, International Bank and CenterState Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00645
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: Margaret I Strickland
3 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by District Judge Margaret I. Strickland denying #3 Motion to Dismiss; granting #3 Motion to Transfer Case. (ke)
November 4, 2021 Filing 20 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Chief District Judge William P. Johnson no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cmm)
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Colorado filed by InBANK, South State Bank, N.A. (Edelman, Spencer)
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Colorado filed by InBANK, South State Bank, N.A.. (George, Christian)
August 17, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by South State Bank, N.A. re #14 Response to Motion of Agreed Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue (George, Christian)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
August 4, 2021 Filing 15 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant South State Bank, N.A. by Christian Peter George (Association Dues - Online Payment) (George, Christian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Colorado filed by Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler. (Edelman, Spencer)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler Pro Hac Vice Certification (Edelman, Spencer)
August 4, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7821204 re: # 15 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by South State Bank, N.A. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(George, Christian)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler by Spencer L Edelman on behalf of: Daniel Colston Brooks Pierce Law Firm 2000 Renaissance Plaza, 230 North Elm StreetGreensboro, NC 27401 336.271.3109 Fax 336.232.9109 DColston@BrooksPierce.c (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Edelman, Spencer)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler by Spencer L Edelman on behalf of: Daniel Adams Brooks Pierce Law Firm 2000 Renaissance Plaza, 230 North Elm StreetGreensboro, NC 27401 336.271.3109 Fax 336.232.9109 DAdams@BrooksPierce.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Edelman, Spencer)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler by Spencer L Edelman on behalf of: James C. Adams, II Brooks Pierce Law Firm 2000 Renaissance Plaza, 230 North Elm StreetGreensboro, NC 27401 336.271.3109 Fax 336.232.9109 JADAMS@BrooksPierce.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Edelman, Spencer)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler by Spencer L Edelman on behalf of: S. Leigh Rodenbough, IV (Bo) Brooks Pierce Law Firm 2000 Renaissance Plaza, 230 North Elm StreetGreensboro, NC 27401 336.271.3109 Fax 336.232.9109 brodenbough@BrooksPierce.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Edelman, Spencer)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 3, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7818380 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Edelman, Spencer)
August 3, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7818464 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Edelman, Spencer)
August 3, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7818444 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Edelman, Spencer)
August 3, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7818393 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Frederick V. Eichler, Michele M. Eichler (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Edelman, Spencer)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by InBANK, South State Bank, N.A. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Colorado (Attachments: #1 Affidavit -Declaration of Nicole Comer) (McKleroy, Michael)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTRY OF A SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Considering the pending motion seeking dispositive relief, the Court hereby finds good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 to delay holding a scheduling conference and entering a scheduling order. The Court will set the case for scheduling once the presiding judge resolves the pending motion. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (atc)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Colorado by InBANK, South State Bank, N.A.. (McKleroy, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7788880 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by InBANK, South State Bank, N.A. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(McKleroy, Michael)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 1st Judicial District; Santa Fe County, case number D-101-CV-2021-01248. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summons return - South State Bank, N.A., #4 Exhibit 3 - Summons return InBANK, #5 Exhibit 4 - Docket sheet, #6 Exhibit 5 - Civil cover sheet)(McKleroy, Michael)
July 14, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eichler et al v. InBANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InBANK
Represented By: Steven L. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South State Bank, N.A. formerly known as CenterState Bank, N.A. doing business as ARC Fixed Rate Provider
Represented By: Michael McKleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Bank
Represented By: Steven L. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenterState Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael McKleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick V. Eichler, IV
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele M. Eichler
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Represented By: Daniel D. Adams
Represented By: Daniel Colston
Represented By: James C. Adams, II
Represented By: S. Leigh Rodenbough, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick V. Eichler
Represented By: Daniel D. Adams
Represented By: Daniel Colston
Represented By: James C. Adams, II
Represented By: S. Leigh Rodenbough, IV
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?