Carraro v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Carraro
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00646
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Judith C Herrera
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company Allstates First set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Plaintiff (Burke, Sonya)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Allstate Insurance Company (Russell, Nicole)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 **FILED IN ERROR** Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Allstate Insurance Company (Russell, Nicole) Modified on 9/8/2021-filed in error per attorney N. Russell. (cmm).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Carraro of Intitial Disclosures (Dunn, A.)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Burke, Sonya)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole T. Russell on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Russell, Nicole)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Allstate Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Noya, Jennifer)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Allstate's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Burke, Sonya)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 9/15/2021 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 9/8/2021. The parties are reminded that unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/5/2021. (cda)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 9/3/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/5/2021. (cda)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Second Judicial District, case number D-202-CV-2021-03614. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Sonya)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number BNMDC-7786928 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burke, Sonya)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carraro v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Carraro
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Jared Robert Vander Dussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Represented By: Sonya R. Burke
Represented By: Nicole T. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?