Charlie et al v. Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services
Plaintiff: Alicia Charlie, Leona Garcia Lacy, Darrell Tsosie, E.H., a minor by and through guardian Gary Hick and E.H.
Defendant: Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv00652
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alicia Charlie, E.H., Leona Garcia Lacy, Darrell Tsosie (Martinez, Kristina)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiffs to seek leave to join and amend by 10/29/2021. Defendant to seek leave to join and amend by 11/30/2021. Expert disclosures due as set forth herein. Discovery except discovery relating to substantive experts due by 12/30/2022. Discovery motions due by 01/20/2023. Pretrial motions due by 02/13/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiffs to Defendant by 05/30/2023 and from Defendant to the Court by 06/12/2023. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification due by 04/29/2022. Defendant's Response to Motion for Class Certification due by 05/27/2022. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, if any, due by 06/10/2022. (tl)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/27/2021. (tl)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alicia Charlie, E.H., Leona Garcia Lacy, Darrell Tsosie Initial Disclosures (Martinez, Kristina)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services Defendant Rule 26 Initial Disclosure (Biehler, Gregory)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Alicia Charlie, E.H., Leona Garcia Lacy, Darrell Tsosie (Martinez, Kristina)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services. (Biehler, Gregory)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services identifying Corporate Parent Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services for Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services. (Biehler, Gregory)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services (Biehler, Gregory)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 10 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services, 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by E.H., Darrell Tsosie, Leona Garcia Lacy, Alicia Charlie. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Alicia Charlie, E.H., Leona Garcia Lacy, Darrell Tsosie voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Biehler, Gregory)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Alicia Charlie, E.H., Leona Garcia Lacy, Darrell Tsosie by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: Gary M. Klinger MASON LIETZ & KLINGER LLP 227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 2100Chicago, IL 60606 (202) 975-0477 gklinger@masonllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Alicia Charlie, E.H., Leona Garcia Lacy, Darrell Tsosie by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: David K. Lietz MASON LIETZ & KLINGER LLP 5101 Wisconsin Ave., NW, Suite 305Washington, DC 20016 (202) 640-1160 dlietz@masonllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Alicia Charlie, E.H., Leona Garcia Lacy, Darrell Tsosie by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: Gary E. Mason MASON LIETZ & KLINGER LLP 5101 Wisconsin Ave., NW, Suite 305Washington, DC 20016 (202) 640-1160 gmason@masonllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Alicia Charlie, E.H., Leona Garcia Lacy, Darrell Tsosie Certification of Good Standing (Martinez, Kristina)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7800620 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by E.H., Darrell Tsosie, Leona Garcia Lacy, Alicia Charlie (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7800616 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by E.H., Darrell Tsosie, Leona Garcia Lacy, Alicia Charlie (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7800624 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by E.H., Darrell Tsosie, Leona Garcia Lacy, Alicia Charlie (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 8/6/2021. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 8/17/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/27/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call the Court's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/20/2021. (tl)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Extension of Time for Defendant to File Response to Complaint (Biehler, Gregory)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services (Biehler, Gregory)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services from Eleventh Judicial District Court, McKinley County, case number D-1113-CV-2021-00235. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biehler, Gregory)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7789666 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Biehler, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charlie et al v. Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Charlie
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Represented By: David K Lietz
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Garcia Lacy
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Represented By: David K Lietz
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Tsosie
Represented By: David K Lietz
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.H., a minor by and through guardian Gary Hick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.H.
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Represented By: David K Lietz
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?