Garcia v. Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC
Plaintiff: Rickilee M. Garcia
Defendant: Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00682
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC of Agreed Extension (Pierce, Kevin)
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 7 Notice of Magistrate Judge Reassignment (Text Only). Mail sent to David K. Lietz (jg)
August 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC re 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Pro Hac Vice Certification of Jacob Radecki of McDonald Hopkins LLC (Pierce, Kevin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC re 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Pro Hac Vice Certification of Christopher G. Dean of McDonald Hopkins LLC (Pierce, Kevin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC by Kevin D Pierce on behalf of: Christopher G. Dean McDonald Hopkins LLC 300 North LaSalle, Suite 1400Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 208-0111 cdean@mcdonaldhopkins.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Pierce, Kevin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC by Kevin D Pierce on behalf of: Jacob Radecki McDonald Hopkins LLC 300 North LaSalle, Suite 1400Chicago, IL 60654 Phone: (312) 208-0111 jradecki@mcdonaldhopkins.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Pierce, Kevin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC re #1 Complaint Notice of Agreed Extension to Respond to Complaint on or before September 13, 2021 (Pierce, Kevin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D Pierce on behalf of Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC (Pierce, Kevin)
August 12, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7835899 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Pierce, Kevin)
August 12, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7835887 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Pierce, Kevin)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Home Medical Equipment Specialists LLC on 07/26/2021, filed by Rickilee M. Garcia. (Lietz, David)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 FILED IN ERROR - ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Rickilee M. Garcia by David K Lietz (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lietz, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 7/29/2021 (arp).
July 29, 2021 REFUND REQUESTED - Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7811187 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rickilee M. Garcia (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lietz, David) Modified on 7/29/2021 (arp).
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent notice must be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Rickilee M. Garcia Certification of Good Standing (Martinez, Kristina)
July 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC. (jg)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Rickilee M. Garcia by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: Gary M. Klinger MASON LIETZ & KLINGER LLP 227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 2100Chicago, IL 60606 (202) 975-0477 gklinger@masonllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Rickilee M. Garcia by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: David K. Lietz MASON LIETZ & KLINGER LLP 5101 Wisconsin Ave., NW, Suite 305Washington, DC 20016 (202) 640-1160 dlietz@masonllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Rickilee M. Garcia by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: Gary E. Mason MASON LIETZ & KLINGER LLP 5101 Wisconsin Ave., NW, Suite 305Washington, DC 20016 (202) 640-1160 gmason@masonllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Rickilee M. Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Martinez, Kristina)
July 22, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7800054 re #1 Complaint filed by Rickilee M. Garcia (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina)
July 22, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7800125 re: # 2 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rickilee M. Garcia (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina)
July 22, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7800163 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rickilee M. Garcia (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina)
July 22, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
July 22, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7800134 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rickilee M. Garcia (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickilee M. Garcia
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: David K Lietz
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Medical Equipment Specialists, LLC
Represented By: Christopher G. Dean
Represented By: Jacob Radecki
Represented By: Kevin D Pierce
Represented By: Tiffany L Roach Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?