McCall v. Wagner Equipment Co.
Plaintiff: D McCall
Defendant: Wagner Equipment Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00715
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wagner Equipment Co. for Initial Disclosures (Heaphy, Elizabeth)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Settlement Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 09:00 AM remote via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 2/3/2022. Motions due by 3/7/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2022. (ccp)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/22/2021. (ccp)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Wagner Equipment Co. (Heaphy, Elizabeth)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 9/15/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/2/2021. (ccp)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wagner Equipment Co. identifying Corporate Parent Wagner Equipment Company for Wagner Equipment Co.. (Heaphy, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 2, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
August 2, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7815547 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wagner Equipment Co. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Heaphy, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wagner Equipment Co.. (Heaphy, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wagner Equipment Co. from Second Judicial District Court, case number d202cv202103697. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Wagner Equipment Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heaphy, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Wagner Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D McCall
Represented By: Alexandra W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner Equipment Co.
Represented By: Elizabeth Heaphy
Represented By: Robert J. Muehlenweg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?