Kantor v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kevin Anthony Kantor
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00717
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration, 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Kevin Anthony Kantor. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
August 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Kevin Anthony Kantor voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Dengler, Amber)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Kevin Anthony Kantor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dengler, Amber)
August 2, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7815656 re #1 Complaint filed by Kevin Anthony Kantor (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dengler, Amber)
August 2, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kantor v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Anthony Kantor
Represented By: Amber L Dengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?