Ortega v. Edgman et al
Plaintiff: Max Ortega III
Defendant: William Edgman, Louise Lopez, New Mexico Department of Corrections and Does 1-50
Case Number: 1:2021cv00728
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Louise Lopez, New Mexico Department of Corrections of Agreed Upon Extension (Sivage, Mariposa)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Max Ortega III. (Bullion, Todd)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Max Ortega III. (Bullion, Todd) Modified on 9/21/2021 (yc).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of agreed Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Max Ortega III. (Bullion, Todd) Modified on 9/6/2021 (yc).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Louise Lopez, New Mexico Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sivage, Mariposa)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Luis Lopez, New Mexico Department of Corrections from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-1340. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Luis Lopez, New Mexico Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sivage, Mariposa)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7820826 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by New Mexico Department of Corrections (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sivage, Mariposa)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Edgman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Ortega III
Represented By: Benjamin Gubernick
Represented By: Todd J. Bullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Edgman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Lopez
Represented By: Noe Astorga-Corral
Represented By: Mariposa Padilla Sivage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noe Astorga-Corral
Represented By: Mariposa Padilla Sivage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?