Tucker v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: Britney Cassandra Tucker
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 1:2021cv00735
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank. (Heaphy, Elizabeth)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Britney Cassandra Tucker. (Tucker, Britney)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order re #8 by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting Plaintiff leave to file electronically in this case only. See Guide for Pro Se Litigants at 13, District of New Mexico (November 2019) ("approval to electronically file documents within a case must be granted by the presiding judge for each case in which the pro se litigant wishes to file using their CM/ECF account"). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cd)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank. (Heaphy, Elizabeth)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank Certificate of Good Standing (Heaphy, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: #7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Britney Cassandra Tucker, 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Wells Fargo Bank. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Wells Fargo Bank voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Heaphy, Elizabeth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to file electronically via CM/ECF by Britney Cassandra Tucker. (jg)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Britney Cassandra Tucker voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (jg)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 CM/ECF PRO SE NOTIFICATION FORM electing to receive notification via e-mail by Britney Cassandra Tucker (jg)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank of Stipulated Extension of Deadline to Respond (Heaphy, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank by Elizabeth Heaphy on behalf of: Nermana Pehlic Fisher & Phillips LLP 3200 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1550Phoenix, Arizona 85012-2487 (602)281-3400 Fax (602)281-3401 npehlic@fisherphillips.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Heaphy, Elizabeth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank by Elizabeth Heaphy on behalf of: Pavneet Singh Uppal Fisher & Phillips LLP 3200 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1550Phoenix, Arizona 85012-2487 (602)281-3400 Fax (602)281-3401 puppal@fisherphillips.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Heaphy, Elizabeth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7834539 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Wells Fargo Bank (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Heaphy, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7834678 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Wells Fargo Bank (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Heaphy, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7827357 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Heaphy, Elizabeth)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank from Thirteenth Judicial Court, case number d1314cv202100528. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Wells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heaphy, Elizabeth)
August 5, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United Stats Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britney Cassandra Tucker
Represented By: Britney Cassandra Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Elizabeth Heaphy
Represented By: Nermana Pehlic
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?