Tucker v. University Board of Regents et al
Plaintiff: Haley Tucker
Defendant: University Board of Regents, University of New Mexico School of Law and Dean Sergio Pareja
Case Number: 1:2021cv00736
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Second MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to Recover Damages Due to Deprivation of Civil Rights filed by Haley Tucker. (Garcia, Derek)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Dean Sergio Pareja, University Board of Regents, University of New Mexico School of Law (Wigley-Delara, Alisa)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 Second MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to Recover Damages Due to Deprivation of Civil Rights by Dean Sergio Pareja, University Board of Regents, University of New Mexico School of Law. (Wigley-Delara, Alisa)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants., filed by Haley Tucker. (Garcia, Derek)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Haley Tucker. (Garcia, Derek)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 ERRATA NOTICE OF ERRATA by Dean Sergio Pareja, University Board of Regents, University of New Mexico School of Law (Wigley-Delara, Alisa)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Haley Tucker, 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge,, filed by Dean Sergio Pareja, University Board of Regents, University of New Mexico School of Law. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Dean Sergio Pareja, University Board of Regents, University of New Mexico School of Law voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Wigley-Delara, Alisa)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Dean Sergio Pareja, University Board of Regents, University of New Mexico School of Law. (Wigley-Delara, Alisa)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John K Ziegler on behalf of All Defendants (Ziegler, John)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Haley Tucker voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Garcia, Derek)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 6, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7825342 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Dean Sergio Pareja, University Board of Regents, University of New Mexico School of Law (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Childers, Darin)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Dean Sergio Pareja, University Board of Regents, University of New Mexico School of Law (Wigley-Delara, Alisa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dean Sergio Pareja, University of New Mexico School of Law, University Board of Regents from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2021-03997. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Dean Sergio Pareja, University of New Mexico School of Law, University Board of Regents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wigley-Delara, Alisa)
August 5, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. University Board of Regents et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Tucker
Represented By: Derek V. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Board of Regents
Represented By: Alisa Wigley-Delara
Represented By: John K Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of New Mexico School of Law
Represented By: Alisa Wigley-Delara
Represented By: John K Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Sergio Pareja
Represented By: Alisa Wigley-Delara
Represented By: John K Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?