Jacobo-Rosas v. United States
Petitioner: Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas
Respondent: United States
Case Number: 1:2021cv00791
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT by District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (baw)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera dismissing without prejudice Petitioner Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas' Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 and Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus #3 ; Jacobo-Rosas' Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #4 is granted; Petitioners Motion to Proceed With Release #6 , Respondent's Motion to Strike #9 , and Petitioners Motion for Summary Judgment #10 are denied as moot; a Certificate of Appealability is denied. (baw)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas. (mjr)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #7 Letter, #1 Petition for 2254 Relief, #6 MOTION for Order, #3 HABEAS CORPUS PETITION under 28 U.S.C. 2241 and First Step Act of 2018, #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Financial Entry by United States. (Mote, Nicholas)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INMATE ACCOUNT by Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas (mjr)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter by Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas (mjr)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed with Release by Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas. (mjr)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Scott Mote on behalf of United States (Mote, Nicholas)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas. (mjr)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 HABEAS CORPUS PETITION under 28 U.S.C. 2241 and First Step Act of 2018, filed by Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas. (mjr)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to Cure Defects by 9/20/2021. (KBM)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas. (jg)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobo-Rosas v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabriel Jacobo-Rosas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Mote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?