Head v. City of Farmington et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Head
Defendant: City of Farmington, James Prince, John Briseno and Steve Hebbe
Case Number: 1:2021cv00929
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by John Briseno, City of Farmington, Steve Hebbe, James Prince Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Robles, Luis)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 12/9/2021 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 12/2/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/19/2021. (cd)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Complaint for Civil Rights Violations and Tort Claims by John Briseno, City of Farmington, Steve Hebbe, James Prince. (Robles, Luis)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 22, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee received online: $ 402, receipt number BNMDC-7902649 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402., receipt number BNMDC-7902649 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Briseno, James Prince, City of Farmington, Steve Hebbe Notice of Removal from Eleventh Judicial District Court, case number D-1116-CV-2021-00785. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by John Briseno, James Prince, City of Farmington, Steve Hebbe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robles, Luis) filed by James Prince, Steve Hebbe, John Briseno, City of Farmington (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Robles on behalf of John Briseno, City of Farmington, Steve Hebbe, James Prince (Robles, Luis)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Briseno, James Prince, City of Farmington, Steve Hebbe Notice of Removal from Eleventh Judicial District Court, case number D-1116-CV-2021-00785. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by John Briseno, James Prince, City of Farmington, Steve Hebbe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robles, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Head v. City of Farmington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Farmington
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Prince
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Briseno
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hebbe
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?