Candelaria v. Vroom Automotive, LLC
Plaintiff: Adam Candelaria
Defendant: Vroom Automotive, LLC and Vroom Automotive, LLC doing business as Vroom.com
Case Number: 1:2021cv00957
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Letter by U.S. District Court remanding case to Second Judicial District Court (jg)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #3 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw its #1 Notice of Removal. All other pending motions are MOOT. This case is REMANDED to the Second Judicial District Court for the State of New Mexico, County of Bernalillo. The Clerk is also directed to forward a certified copy of this Order to that Court and to administratively close this case. (am)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, by Vroom Automotive, LLC. (Horowitz, Louis)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 30, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vroom Automotive, LLC from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2021-03990. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Vroom Automotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint- D-202-CV-2021-03990, #2 Exhibit Summons- D-202-CV-2021-03990, #3 Exhibit Cert Arb -D-202-CV-2021-03990, #4 Exhibit Jury Demand -D-202-CV-2021-03990, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Horowitz, Louis)
September 29, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7916750 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Vroom Automotive, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Horowitz, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candelaria v. Vroom Automotive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Candelaria
Represented By: Joshua Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vroom Automotive, LLC
Represented By: Louis Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vroom Automotive, LLC doing business as Vroom.com
Represented By: Louis Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?