Kottke Cattle, LLC v. Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kottke Cattle, LLC
Defendant: Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC, Narciso Perez and Sean Perez
Counter Defendant: Neal Kottke and Glen Kottke
Case Number: 1:2021cv01004
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Neal Kottke and Glen Kottke's ANSWER to #28 Third Party Complaint Zia Agricultural Consulting LLC by Neal Kottke.(Kochersberger, Donald)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Kottke Cattle's ANSWER to #27 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim to Defendant Zia Agricultural Consulting LLC by Kottke Cattle, LLC(an Illinois Limited Liability Company).(Kochersberger, Donald)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC(a New Mexico Limited Liability Company), Narciso Perez, Sean Perez. Neal Kottke served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021. (Worden, John)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC(a New Mexico Limited Liability Company), Narciso Perez, Sean Perez. Glen Kottke served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021. (Worden, John)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Glen Kottke, Neal Kottke, filed by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC(a New Mexico Limited Liability Company), Narciso Perez, Sean Perez. (Worden, John)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #26 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Kottke Cattle, LLC by Narciso Perez, Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC, Sean Perez. (Worden, John)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Glen Kottke, Neal Kottke on Third Party Complaint. (dr)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Kottke Cattle, LLC by Sean Perez, Narciso Perez, Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Kottke Cattle, LLC.(Worden, John)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC re 23 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing for attorney Sarah E. Diamond (Burney, Rameez)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC of Certificate of Good Standing for attorney John S. Worden (Burney, Rameez)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC by Rameez Burney on behalf of: Sarah E. Diamond Venable LLP 2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300Los Angeles, CA 90067 310-229-0321 Fax 310-229-9901 SEDiamond@Venable.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burney, Rameez)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC by Rameez Burney on behalf of: John S. Worden Venable LLP 101 California Street, Suite 3800San Francisco, CA 94111 415-653-3713 Fax 415-653-3755 JSWorden@Venable.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burney, Rameez)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7976133 re: # 22 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burney, Rameez)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7976147 re: # 23 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burney, Rameez)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Deposit Funds in Court Registry (bap)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC (Worden, John)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Deposit Funds in Court Registry by Kottke Cattle, LLC. (Kochersberger, Donald)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by Kottke Cattle, LLC Re LLC Ownership (Kochersberger, Donald)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2021 re 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Court Reporter J. Bean) (bap)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rameez Burney on behalf of All Defendants (Burney, Rameez)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Plaintiff's REPLY re #13 Objections filed by Kottke Cattle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kochersberger, Donald)
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION re #13 Objections DECLARATION OF NARCISO PEREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC (Worden, John)
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OBJECTIONS re #6 Memorandum Opinion and Order, DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC (Worden, John)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kottke Cattle, LLC. Sean Perez served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Kochersberger, Donald)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kottke Cattle, LLC. Narciso Perez served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Kochersberger, Donald)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kottke Cattle, LLC. Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Kochersberger, Donald)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC re 8 Notice of Hearing on Motion,,,, DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO APPEAR BY ZOOM VIDEO AT HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TRO (Worden, John)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 2 scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Should a party wish to appear remotely for this hearing they shall notify the Court by filing a written notice no later than 10/22/2021 indicating the preferred method of attendance (via telephone, via Zoom or any other desired method). Upon receipt of notification that one or more of the party(ies) wishes to appear remotely via Zoom the Court will schedule the Zoom session and provide connectivity details to the parties through separate notice/communication. Parties wishing to appear telephonically can connect to the hearing by contacting (888) 684-8852 Access Code: 5469085Absent notification as indicated above, the Court will presume an in-person appearance is intended and plan accordingly. (lr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 2 scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Should a party wish to appear remotely for this hearing they shall notify the Court by filing a written notice no later than 10/22/2021 indicating the preferred method of attendance (via telephone, via Zoom or any other desired method). Upon receipt of notification that one or more of the party(ies) wishes to appear remotely via Zoom the Court will schedule the Zoom session and provide connectivity details to the parties through separate notice/communication. Parties wishing to appear telephonically can connect to the hearing by contacting (888) 684-8852 Access Code: 5469085Absent notification as indicated above, the Court will presume an in-person appearance is intended and plan accordingly. (lr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning that: (i) Kottke Cattles request for a TRO in Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed October 15, 2021 doc 2 (Ex Parte), is denied; and (ii) the hearing on the PI is set for Tuesday, October 26, 2021, at 10:00 am (bap) Modified text on 10/21/2021 (bap).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint Verification by Kottke Cattle, LLC (Kochersberger, Donald)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Narciso Perez, Sean Perez, Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC. (jg)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States District Judge Martha Vazquez no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kottke Cattle, LLC (Kochersberger, Donald)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by KOTTKE CATTLE, LLC, an Illinois Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kochersberger, Donald)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7943397 re #1 Complaint filed by Kottke Cattle, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kochersberger, Donald)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kottke Cattle, LLC v. Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kottke Cattle, LLC
Represented By: Alicia M. McConnell
Represented By: Donald Kochersberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zia Agricultural Consulting, LLC
Represented By: George D. Giddens, Jr.
Represented By: John S Worden
Represented By: Rameez Burney
Represented By: Sarah E Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narciso Perez
Represented By: George D. Giddens, Jr.
Represented By: Rameez Burney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Perez
Represented By: George D. Giddens, Jr.
Represented By: Rameez Burney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Neal Kottke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Glen Kottke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?