Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC v. Approximately $452,419.56 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC
Defendant: Approximately $452,419.56 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2021cv01021
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC. Approximately $452,419.56 in United States Currency served on 11/24/2021, answer due 1/24/2022. (Lowry, Marc)
November 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (dr)
November 10, 2021 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (arp)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC Member Attorney's Certification in Support of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Out of State Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Anthony R. Todd) (Lowry, Marc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC Member Attorney's Certification in Support of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Out of State Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of A. Scott Bolden) (Lowry, Marc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC Member Attorney's Certification in Support of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Out of State Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of R. Qureshi) (Lowry, Marc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC by Marc M Lowry on behalf of: Rizwan A. Qureshi Reed Smith LLP 1301 K Street NW, Suite 1000, East TowerWashington, DC 20005 202-414-9218 Fax 202-414-9299 rqureshi@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lowry, Marc)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC by Marc M Lowry on behalf of: A. Scott Bolden Reed Smith LLP 1301 K Street NW, Suite 1000, East TowerWashington, DC 20005 202-414-9218 Fax 202-414-9299 ABolden@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lowry, Marc)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 25, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7958258 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lowry, Marc)
October 25, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7958259 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lowry, Marc)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 21, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
October 21, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7950837 re #1 Complaint,, filed by Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lowry, Marc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ROBOTICS MANAGEMENT LEARNING SYSTEMS LLCS PETITION TO ASSERT A CLAIM OF INTEREST IN SEIZED FUNDS LOCATED IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT 435003347636 AND PETITION FOR HEARING TO ADJUDICATE THE VALIDITY OF THAT INTEREST against U.S. Government ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lowry, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC v. Approximately $452,419.56 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robotics Management Learning Systems LLC
Represented By: Marc M Lowry
Represented By: A. Scott Bolden
Represented By: Rizwan A. Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $452,419.56 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?