Assed v. CreditOne, LLC.
Plaintiff: Aziza Assed
Defendant: CreditOne, LLC., CreditOne, L.L.C., Guglielmo and Associates and Eliza Guglielmo
Case Number: 1:2021cv01033
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Aziza Assed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Gorence, Robert)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 **FILED IN ERROR** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Aziza Assed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Gorence, Robert) Modified on 2/23/2023 - FIE, not signed (cmm).
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 THIRD ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Settlement Conference set for 5/9/2023 at 09:00 AM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The Court will provide instructions and a ZOOM invitation in the days preceding the settlement conference. Telephone Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 5/2/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. See Order for additional instructions and deadlines. (kc)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SECOND ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Discovery due by 8/21/2023; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 5/23/2023; Defendants' Expert Witness List due by 06/22/2023; Discovery Motions due by 09/11/2023; Pretrial Motions due by 9/21/2023. (kc)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/22/2023. (kc)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephone Status Conference set for 2/22/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Eliza Guglielmo, Guglielmo and Associates (Jones, Christopher)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AMENDED JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Amended Joint Status Report is due by 02/09/2023. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part #31 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 4 of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (bap)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 "FILED IN ERROR" wrong PDF attached. MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part #31 Partial Motion to Dismiss (bap) Modified on 1/19/2023 (bap).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #37 Motion to Vacate Case Management Deadlines. Having heard from the parties, the Court will stay discovery pending a ruling on the pending Motion to Dismiss. The parties will file an Amended Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days of the ruling. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/12/2022. (kc)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/12/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect with the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Vacate Order Adopting Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Aziza Assed. (Cavaleri, Christina)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 4 of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Eliza Guglielmo, Guglielmo and Associates. (Jones, Christopher)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 4 of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Aziza Assed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Gorence, Robert)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #33 Motion to Reschedule July 5, 2022, Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference and July 13, 2022, Settlement Conference. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Court's Second Order Setting Settlement Conference (Doc. 26) are VACATED. The Court will reschedule the settlement conference by separate order at a later date. All case management deadlines remain in place. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Reschedule 7.5.22 Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference and 7.13.22 Settlement Conference by Eliza Guglielmo, Guglielmo and Associates. (Jones, Christopher)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 4 of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Eliza Guglielmo, Guglielmo and Associates. (Jones, Christopher)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by CreditOne, L.L.C.. (Chaney, Christian)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE by CreditOne, L.L.C. of Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint (Chaney, Christian)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to Eliza Guglielmo, Guglielmo and Associates. (jg)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting #23 Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint. (crc)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by CreditOne, L.L.C.. (Chaney, Christian)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SECOND ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2022 at 09:00 AM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The Court will provide instructions and a ZOOM invitation in the days preceding the settlement conference. Telephone Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 7/5/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. See Order for additional instructions and deadlines. (kc)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule March 16, 2022, Settlement Conference and Amend Case Management Deadlines. (kc)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Continue the March 16, 2022, Settlement Conference and Reset Deadlines so that Additional Defendants may be Served and Participate in Settlement Negotiations by Aziza Assed. (Gorence, Robert)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/11/2022; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 6/10/2022; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 07/25/2022; Discovery Motions due by 09/01/2022; Pretrial Motions due by 9/12/2022. (kc)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Aziza Assed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gorence, Robert)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Settlement Conference set for 3/16/2022 at 01:00 PM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The Court will provide instructions and a ZOOM invitation in the days preceding the settlement conference. Telephone Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the pre-settlement conference proceedings. (kc)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Discovery due by 6/27/2022; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 4/26/2022; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 06/10/2022; Discovery Motions due by 07/18/2022; Pretrial Motions due by 7/28/2022. (kc)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/26/2022. (kc)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATUS REPORT and Provisional Discovery Plan (Amended) by Aziza Assed (Gorence, Robert)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN by CreditOne, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Email Chain) (Chaney, Christian)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SECOND ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2022 is VACATED and rescheduled for 1/26/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. The parties' Joint Status Report is due 01/18/2022. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CreditOne, L.L.C.. (Chaney, Christian)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by CreditOne, L.L.C. of Certification of Good Standing and Entry of Appearance of Counsel (Vigil, Charles)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant CreditOne, L.L.C. by Charles J. Vigil on behalf of: Christian S. Chaney Stanley, Reuter, Ross, Thornton & Alford, LLC 909 Poydras Street, Suite 2500New Orleans, LA 70112 (504) 523-1580 csc@stanleyreuter.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Vigil, Charles)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant CreditOne, L.L.C. by Charles J. Vigil on behalf of: W. Raley Alford, III Stanley, Reuter, Ross, Thornton & Alford, LLC 909 Poydras Street, Suite 2500New Orleans, LA 70112 (504) 523-1580 csc@stanleyreuter.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Vigil, Charles)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8045783 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by CreditOne, L.L.C. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Vigil, Charles)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8045794 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by CreditOne, L.L.C. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Vigil, Charles)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by CreditOne, L.L.C.. (Vigil, Charles)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2021 is VACATED and rescheduled for 1/5/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. The Joint Status Report is due by 12/27/2021. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CreditOne, L.L.C.. (Vigil, Charles)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Aziza Assed and 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by CreditOne, L.L.C.. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bw)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by CreditOne, L.L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Errata Return of Service) (Vigil, Charles)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), CreditOne, L.L.C. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Vigil, Charles)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by CreditOne, L.L.C. of Extension to Respond to Complaint (Vigil, Charles)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Aziza Assed voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Gorence, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2021. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/15/2021. (kc)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CreditOne, LLC. (Vigil, Charles)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CreditOne, LLC. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2021-05002. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by CreditOne, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vigil, Charles)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7957238 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CreditOne, LLC. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Vigil, Charles)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assed v. CreditOne, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziza Assed
Represented By: Robert J. Gorence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CreditOne, LLC.
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CreditOne, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christian S. Chaney
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guglielmo and Associates
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Jones
Represented By: Jaime L. Wiesenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliza Guglielmo
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Jones
Represented By: Jaime L. Wiesenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?