WildEarth Guardians v. Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Bureau of Land Management and Kymm Gresset
Case Number: 1:2021cv01218
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), WildEarth Guardians voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Childress, Sidney)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Defendants on January 3, 2022, filed by WildEarth Guardians. (Childress, Sidney)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WildEarth Guardians (Childress, Sidney)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 28, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr)
December 28, 2021 Summons Issued as to Kymm Gresset, U.S. Bureau of Land Management. (dr)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by WildEarth Guardians re #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet (Childress, Sidney)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for FOIA Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Public Law, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit Expert Report, #6 Exhibit Bureau Reclamation report, #7 Exhibit the Saltcedar EA, #8 Exhibit trespass documentation, #9 Exhibit Court's prior Order, #10 Exhibit Court's prior Order, #11 Exhibit IBLA 2016-203, #12 Exhibit FOIA letter Nov. 12, #13 Exhibit FOIA letter Dec. 6)(Childress, Sidney)
December 27, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8049585 re #1 Complaint,, filed by WildEarth Guardians (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Childress, Sidney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WildEarth Guardians v. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Sidney Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kymm Gresset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?