United States of America v. Yearout Mechanical, Inc.
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Yearout Mechanical, Inc. and Empire Insurance, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021mc00016
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Order to Supplement re #5 Order filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Lucero, Manuel)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Order to Supplement; Responses due by 3/15/2021 (kd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Order to Supplement by United States of America. (Lucero, Manuel)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER To Supplement by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kd)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Reference by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (jjs)
February 18, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (ng)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order by District Judge Martha Vazquez GRANTING Motion to Consolidate Cases. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case, United States v. Empire Insurance, Ltd. 21-MC-17-MV, and Yearout Mechanical, Inc., 21-MC-16-KG, shall be consolidated under United States v. Yearout Mechanical, Inc., 21-MC-16-KG re #2 ; (yc)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to consolidate cases by United States of America (motion filed on 1/29/2021 in MC 21-17MV) (yc)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons , filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lucero, Manuel)
January 15, 2021 United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Yearout Mechanical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yearout Mechanical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Empire Insurance, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?