Harrington v. 360 ABQ, LLC
Defendant: 360 ABQ, LLC doing business as 360 Ventures Real Estate
Counter Defendant: Blaine Harrington, III
Counter Claimant: 360 ABQ, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00063
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike #5 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Blaine Harrington, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain) (DeSouza, Daniel)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike #5 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Defendant filed by 360 ABQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FRE 408 Settlement Communication, #2 Errata Certificate of Service) (Squires, Jeffrey)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter VACATING #6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, the R16 Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/19/2022, and all relevant deadlines. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending motion #7 . (Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Strike Defendant's Second Affirmative Defense). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cd)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Strike #5 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Blaine Harrington, III. (DeSouza, Daniel)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/19/2022 at 03:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 4/12/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/30/2022. (cd)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 360 ABQ, LLC d/b/a 360 Ventures Real Estate ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Blaine Harrington III, First COUNTERCLAIM against Blaine Harrington, III by 360 ABQ, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Blaine Harrington, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Certificate of Service)(Squires, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blaine Harrington, III. 360 ABQ, LLC served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (DeSouza, Daniel)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8096297 re #1 Complaint filed by Blaine Harrington, III (Payment made via Pay.gov)(DeSouza, Daniel)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Report re: copyright (jg)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 360 ABQ, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Blaine Harrington, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSouza, Daniel)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to 360 ABQ, LLC. (jg)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. 360 ABQ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Blaine Harrington, III
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360 ABQ, LLC doing business as 360 Ventures Real Estate
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: 360 ABQ, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?