Adler Medical, LLC et al v. Harrington
Plaintiff: Adler Medical, LLC, Walt Arnold Commercial Brokerage, Inc., Xuan Nation, LLC and NM CCIM Chapter of the Commercial Real Estate Institute
Defendant: Blaine Harrington, III
3Rd Party Defendant: CCIM Institute
Case Number: 1:2022cv00072
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN and SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 10/20/2022. Motions due by 11/21/2022. (cda)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 3/30/2022. (cda)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NM CCIM Chapter of the Commercial Real Estate Institute Initial Disclosures (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Xuan Nation, LLC Initial Disclosures (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walt Arnold Commercial Brokerage, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adler Medical, LLC Initial Disclosures (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #21 Motion for Protective Order. (cda)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Protective Order by Adler Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order) (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Adler Medical, LLC (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing denying without prejudice #16 Motion for Protective Order for failure to comply with Judge Fashing's guidelines for protective orders which can be found on her website at https://www.nmd.uscourts.gov/content/honorable-laura-fashing under the "Procedures" tab. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cda)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adler Medical, LLC Production of Documents (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adler Medical, LLC Interrogatories (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by Adler Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order) (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FILED IN ERROR: MOTION for Protective Order by Adler Medical, LLC. (Squires, Jeffrey) Modified to add error text per Attorney phone call received via CMECF help desk on 3/10/2022 (bc).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE for Disclosure Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Walt Arnold Commercial Brokerage, Inc.. (Squires, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 3/2/2022 (dr).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Plaintiffs ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Blaine Harrington, III, COUNTERCLAIM against Blaine Harrington, III by Adler Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Certificate of Service)(Squires, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/23/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/4/2022. (cda)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Plaintiffs' RESPONSE re #9 Order, filed by Adler Medical, LLC, Xuan Nation, LLC. (Squires, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to CCIM Institute. (jg)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Within 21 days of the date of this order, the plaintiffs shall file a response stating the citizenship, as of the time that this case was commenced, of all of the members of plaintiffs Adler Medical, LLC and Xuan Nation, LLC. (ccp)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CCIM Institute, COUNTERCLAIM against Adler Medical, LLC, NM CCIM Chapter of the Commercial Real Estate Institute, Walt Arnold Commercial Brokerage, Inc., Xuan Nation, LLC by Blaine Harrington, III. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by NM CCIM Chapter of the Commercial Real Estate Institute, Xuan Nation, LLC, Walt Arnold Commercial Brokerage, Inc., Adler Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Adler, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Walt Arnold, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Xuan Nation, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - CCIM)(DeSouza, Daniel)
February 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel DeSouza on behalf of Blaine Harrington, III (DeSouza, Daniel)
February 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blaine Harrington, III as to Blaine Harrington, III. (DeSouza, Daniel)
February 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel DeSouza on behalf of Blaine Harrington, III (DeSouza, Daniel)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report re: copyright (jg)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Adler Medical, LLC, NM CCIM Chapter of the Commercial Real Estate Institute, Walt Arnold Commercial Brokerage, Inc., Xuan Nation, LLC (Squires, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT by All Plaintiffs against Blaine Harrington, III ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by NM CCIM Chapter of the Commercial Real Estate Institute, Adler Medical, LLC, Xuan Nation, LLC, Walt Arnold Commercial Brokerage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Squires, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8098752 re #1 Complaint, filed by NM CCIM Chapter of the Commercial Real Estate Institute, Xuan Nation, LLC, Walt Arnold Commercial Brokerage, Inc., Adler Medical, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Squires, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adler Medical, LLC et al v. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adler Medical, LLC
Represented By: Marco H. Santamaria
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walt Arnold Commercial Brokerage, Inc.
Represented By: Marco H. Santamaria
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuan Nation, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NM CCIM Chapter of the Commercial Real Estate Institute
Represented By: Marco H. Santamaria
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Harrington, III
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CCIM Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?