Waldeck v. Wal-Mart Inc.
Plaintiff: Nadine Waldeck
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc. doing business as Wal-Mart Store No. 829
Case Number: 1:2022cv00110
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 18 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 4/12/2022. (kfo)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Settlement Conference set for 8/2/2022 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Letters to Court due 7/22/2022. (kfo)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 10/11/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 11/10/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due to Court by 2/24/2023. (kfo)
March 31, 2022 Filing 14 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Wal-Mart Inc. (Chrisman, Tessa)
March 24, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nadine Waldeck Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement (O'Connor, Cheryl)
March 23, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement by Nadine Waldeck (O'Connor, Cheryl)
March 22, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Inc. First Interrogatories & RFP to Plaintiff (Chrisman, Tessa)
March 22, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Inc. Walmart's Initial Disclosures (Chrisman, Tessa)
March 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Wal-Mart Inc., 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Nadine Waldeck. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Nadine Waldeck voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (O'Connor, Cheryl)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/16/2022. (kfo)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tessa Chrisman on behalf of Wal-Mart Inc. (Chrisman, Tessa)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 Filing Fee: $ 402, receipt number ALB051889 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Wal-Mart Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Muirhead, Megan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Inc. (Muirhead, Megan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Inc. from First Judicial District, County of Santa Fe, case number D-101-CV-2021-02316. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Wal-Mart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-E, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muirhead, Megan)
February 17, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waldeck v. Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Waldeck
Represented By: Cheryl O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc. doing business as Wal-Mart Store No. 829
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Represented By: Tessa Chrisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?