Jensen v. Pacifica Rosemont LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristine Jensen
Defendant: Pacifica Rosemont LLC doing business as Pacifica Senior Living Santa Fe, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC, Deepak Israni and Carla Aragon
Case Number: 1:2022cv00170
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #11 Motion to Stay by Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC (Garcia, Tomas)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC re #11 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Deepak Israni, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC (Garcia, Tomas)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Opposed MOTION to Stay D' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Stay filed by Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC. (Garcia, Tomas)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Kristine Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Rael, Feliz)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by Kristine Jensen. (Rael, Feliz)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 8 and 10. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Wrongful Death, Negligence, Misrepresentation, Unfair Trade Practices, Joint and Several Liability and Punitive Damages by Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC. (Hernandez, Michelle)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand and Attorney Fees for Wrongful Removal filed by Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Garcia, Tomas)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC (Hernandez, Michelle)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Opposed MOTION to Stay by Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Garcia, Tomas)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Kristine Jensen. (Rael, Feliz)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 5) are VACATED. (kc)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC of Filing Motion to Consolidate Case No. 1:22-cv-00170 With Case No. 1:21-cv-01182 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hernandez, Michelle)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2022. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/29/2022. (kc)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC (Hernandez, Michelle)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle A Hernandez on behalf of Deepak Israni, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC (Hernandez, Michelle)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Deepak Israni from First Judicial District Court, New Mexico, case number D-101-CV-2022-00355. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Deepak Israni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Michelle)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8153941 re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Deepak Israni, Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Pacifica Rosemont LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Jensen
Represented By: Feliz A Rael
Represented By: Gregory W. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacifica Rosemont LLC doing business as Pacifica Senior Living Santa Fe
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacifica Companies, LLC
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacifica Senior Living Management, LLC
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepak Israni
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Aragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?