Dean v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Larry Dean
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv00179
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Dean. United States Attorney served on 3/18/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Duran, Michael) Modified docket text on 5/6/2022 (dr).
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Dean. United States Attorney General served on 3/21/2022, answer due 5/20/2022 (Duran, Michael) Modified docket text on 5/6/2022 (dr).
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 **FILED IN ERROR**SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Dean. United States of America served on 3/21/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Duran, Michael) Modified on 5/5/2022 (dr).
March 10, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 10, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
March 10, 2022 Summons Issued as to United States of America and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
March 10, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8159656 re #1 Complaint filed by Larry Dean (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Duran, Michael)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Larry Dean. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duran, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Dean
Represented By: Michael G Duran
Represented By: Daniel T. Cornish
Represented By: Samantha L. Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?