Spak et al v. Riturani et al
Plaintiff: Adam Spak and Tracy Leuthauser
Defendant: Riturani, K S Majha Trans, LLC and Sikhandar Singh
Case Number: 1:2022cv00201
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Adam Spak re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Adam Spak (Sanchez, Dennis)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct with Corrected COS filed by Adam Spak. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tracy Leuthauser, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Results 02072022 for First Mailing to Ritu Rani, #3 Exhibit USPS RRR Mailing Returned 04222022) (Sanchez, Dennis)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Adam Spak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tracy Leuthauser, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Results 02072022 for First Mailing to Ritu Rani, #3 Exhibit USPS RRR Mailing Returned 04222022) (Sanchez, Dennis)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Sikhandar Singh re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction filed by Sikhandar Singh (Eaton, Brett)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Sikhandar Singh re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction filed by Sikhandar Singh (Eaton, Brett) Modified on 5/6/2022 (arp).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction filed by Sikhandar Singh. (Eaton, Brett)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by K S Majha Trans, LLC. (Eaton, Brett)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction filed by Adam Spak. (Sanchez, Dennis)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Plaintiff's #16 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant, Sikhandar Singh's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including April 22, 2022, to file a response to Defendant, Sikhandar Singh's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' response SHALL BE DUE on or before April 22, 2022, by 5:00 p.m. Barring extraordinary circumstances, NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS SHALL BE GRANTED. (ve)
April 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Adam Spak. (Sanchez, Dennis)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding good cause to extend the time to issue the scheduling order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). The Court will delay the issuance of its Initial Scheduling Order pending resolution of #5 Motion to Dismiss and #8 Motion to Amend. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Status Conference held on 04/14/2022. (cm)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough resetting the Telephonic Status Conference for 04/14/2022 at 9:30 AM. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 398-2342 [Access Code: 2418431] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Status Conference held on 04/12/2022. (cm)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 9) is granted. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including 4/18/2022 to respond to Defendant Sikhandar Singh's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (kmt)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Adam Spak. (Sanchez, Dennis)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Adam Spak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion to Amend 04112022 - Police Report 11182018, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Motion to Amend 04112022 - March 22, 2022 e-Mail exchange with Brett Eaton, Opposing Counsel, #3 Appendix Proposed Amended Complaint for Damages for PI 04112022) (Sanchez, Dennis)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 04/12/2022 at 2:30 PM. The purpose of this conference is to discuss the status of the case and any discovery needs. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 398-2342 [Access Code: 2418431] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Defendant KS Majha Trans, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by K S Majha Trans, LLC. (Eaton, Brett)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction by Sikhandar Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit) (Eaton, Brett)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by K S Majha Trans, LLC, Sikhandar Singh of Filing Record before the Eight Judicial District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Eaton, Brett)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by K S Majha Trans, LLC identifying Corporate Parent K S Majha Trans. LLC for K S Majha Trans, LLC. (Eaton, Brett)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by K S Majha Trans, LLC, Sikhandar Singh from Eight Judicial District Court, case number D-820-CV-2021-00393. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by K S Majha Trans, LLC, Sikhandar Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eaton, Brett)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8173942 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sikhandar Singh, K S Majha Trans, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Eaton, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spak et al v. Riturani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Spak
Represented By: Dennis T Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Leuthauser
Represented By: Dennis T Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riturani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K S Majha Trans, LLC
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikhandar Singh
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?