Hunt et al v. The Siegel Group Nevada, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lee Hunt and Diane Lopez
Defendant: The Siegel Group Nevada, Inc, 75 Hotel Circle Holdings, LLC a Nevada limited liability company doing business as Siegel Suites New Mexico, LLC, Tammy Kimball, Joseph Pouges and Stephen Siegel
Case Number: 1:2022cv00278
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Letter by Clerk of U.S. District Court to Clerk of First Judicial District, County of Santa Fe re Remand to State Court (arp)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court First Judicial District Court. (bap)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lee Hunt re #6 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Lee Hunt (Atkins, Tyler)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lee Hunt re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lee Hunt (Atkins, Tyler)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Lee Hunt. (Atkins, Tyler)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lee Hunt. (Atkins, Tyler)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by 75 Hotel Circle Holdings, LLC, Tammy Kimball, The Siegel Group Nevada, Inc of Consent to Removal (Schmehl, Jeramy)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 75 Hotel Circle Holdings, LLC, Tammy Kimball, The Siegel Group Nevada, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Schmehl, Jeramy)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Stephen Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Piazza, Elizabeth)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Stephen Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Piazza, Elizabeth)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Finding Good Cause to Delay Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (ajp)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Lee Hunt. (Atkins, Tyler)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lee Hunt. (Atkins, Tyler)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Stephen Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Piazza, Elizabeth)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 5/16/2022. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at (888) 363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/6/2022. (ajp)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stephen Siegel from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-03201. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Stephen Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Piazza, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8218274 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Stephen Siegel (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Piazza, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt et al v. The Siegel Group Nevada, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Hunt
Represented By: Mark Peter Dinelli
Represented By: Tyler J Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Lopez
Represented By: Mark Peter Dinelli
Represented By: Tyler J Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Siegel Group Nevada, Inc
Represented By: Brian P Brack
Represented By: Christopher J Tebo
Represented By: Jeff Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 75 Hotel Circle Holdings, LLC a Nevada limited liability company doing business as Siegel Suites New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Brian P Brack
Represented By: Christopher J Tebo
Represented By: Jeff Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Kimball
Represented By: Brian P Brack
Represented By: Christopher J Tebo
Represented By: Jeff Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pouges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Siegel
Represented By: Clinton E. Dow
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?